There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Not Invisible Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase intergovernmental coordination to identify and combat violent crime within Indian lands and of Indians.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/02/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/02/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/02/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/02/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/07/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/07/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/30/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/30/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/30/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/11/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 07/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/11/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/01/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States05/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/01/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.