There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Puppy Protection Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to provide for the humane treatment of dogs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/01/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/01/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/01/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 05/01/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/01/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 05/20/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/03/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/11/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/19/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/19/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/09/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 07/09/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 07/10/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 07/23/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/24/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/24/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/13/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 08/23/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/06/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/06/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/06/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 10/08/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/23/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/12/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 11/15/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/17/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/18/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/01/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture05/16/2019 Referred to

As of 01/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2442 - Puppy Protection Act of 2019


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.