There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to increase the preference given, in awarding certain allergies and asthma-related grants, to States that require certain public schools to have allergies and asthma management programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-292. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020Presented to President.
12/17/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/17/2020Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/22/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-530.
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/05/2021Became Public Law No: 116-292. (TXT | PDF)
01/05/2021Signed by President.
12/24/2020HousePresented to President.
12/18/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/17/2020SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7642)
09/30/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/29/2020-3:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2020-3:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5004)
09/29/2020-2:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2468.
09/29/2020-2:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5004-5006)
09/29/2020-2:50pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/22/2020HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
09/22/2020HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-530.
07/15/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/11/2020HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/11/2020HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/08/2020HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
05/03/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/02/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/14/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/14/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/18/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/09/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/23/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/23/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/23/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/23/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/17/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/17/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/26/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/15/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/19/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/19/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 01/08/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/15/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/04/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/12/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/13/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/09/2020
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/09/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 07/21/2020
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/21/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 07/23/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
09/22/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-530
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/03/2019 Referred to
01/08/2020 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/30/2020 Referred to
12/17/2020 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2468.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2468. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-292 (01/05/2021)

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

This bill establishes preferences for grants under the children's asthma treatment program for states that require schools to establish allergy and asthma management programs that include individual action plans for students diagnosed with allergies or asthma.