Committees: H.R.2468 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
09/22/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-530
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/03/2019 Referred to
01/08/2020 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/30/2020 Referred to
12/17/2020 Discharged from