There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BENES Act of 2019
Beneficiary Enrollment Notification and Eligibility Simplification Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish a system to notify individuals approaching Medicare eligibility, to simplify and modernize the eligibility enrollment process, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
07/15/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/15/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/11/2020Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/11/2020Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/08/2020Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
05/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/02/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/03/2019 Referred to
01/08/2020 Hearings by
03/11/2020 Markup by
03/11/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2477. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/2019)

Beneficiary Enrollment Notification and Eligibility Simplification Act of 2019 or the BENES Act of 2019

This bill makes a series of changes to, and requires additional notifications regarding, the Medicare enrollment process.

Specifically, the bill changes the Medicare general enrollment period to October 15-December 31, and requires coverage to begin on the first day of the month following enrollment. (Currently, the general enrollment period is January 1-March 31, and coverage begins July 1.) The bill also generally requires coverage to begin on the first day of the month following enrollment for individuals who enroll in the latter months of their initial enrollment period. (Currently, the longer an individual waits to enroll, the more delayed the effective date of coverage.)

The bill also requires Social Security account statements for individuals ages 60 to 64 to include information about Medicare eligibility, late enrollment penalties, coordination of benefits, and special enrollment populations (e.g., veterans).