There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to treat certain military survivor benefits as earned income for purposes of the kiddie tax.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/02/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (168)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 05/03/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 05/03/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 05/03/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/03/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 05/03/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/03/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/03/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/03/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/08/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/08/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/08/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 05/08/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/08/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/08/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 05/08/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/08/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/08/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 05/08/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/08/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/08/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/08/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/08/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/08/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/09/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 05/09/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/09/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 05/09/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/09/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/09/2019
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 05/09/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/09/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 05/09/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 05/14/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 05/14/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/14/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/14/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 05/14/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 05/14/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/15/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 05/15/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 05/15/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 05/15/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 05/16/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 05/16/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/16/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/16/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/20/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 05/20/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/20/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Cunningham, Joe [D-SC-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/20/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/20/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 05/20/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 05/21/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 05/21/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 05/21/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 05/21/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/21/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/21/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/21/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2019
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/21/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 05/22/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/22/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/22/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/22/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 05/22/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 05/22/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/22/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/22/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 06/05/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/05/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/05/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 06/05/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/09/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/09/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/18/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/18/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 07/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/02/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2481. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/2019)

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

This bill treats certain military survivor benefits that are received by children as earned income of the child for the purposes of the kiddie tax (the tax on the unearned income of children). This has the effect of exempting the benefits from such tax.