There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Other Short Titles for portions of a bill
  • Access to Counsel Act of 2020
  • Affordable Prescriptions for Patients Act of 2020
  • NO BAN Act
  • National Origin-Based Antidiscrimination for Nonimmigrants Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FUTURE Act
Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act

Short Titles as Introduced

FUTURE Act
Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

FUTURE Act
Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize mandatory funding programs for historically Black colleges and universities and other minority-serving institutions.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
07/22/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 184 (Roll no. 154).(text: CR H3638-3639)
07/22/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 183 (Roll no. 153).(text: CR H3625-3628)
12/05/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7734-7735)
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/23/2020SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
07/22/2020-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2020-4:51pmHouseOn motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 184 (Roll no. 154). (text: CR H3638-3639)
07/22/2020-4:12pmHouseOn motion to concur in the Senate amendment with amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 183 (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H3625-3628)
07/22/2020-12:12pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - 1At the conclusion of debate on the Jayapal motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b) of H. Res. 891, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
07/22/2020-12:12pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/22/2020-11:47amHousePursuant to H. Res. 891, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on the motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(b). (consideration: CR H3638-3642, H3666-3667)
07/22/2020-11:46amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jayapal motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment with an amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Nadler demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
07/22/2020-11:46amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/22/2020-10:37amHouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate on the House amendment to the Senate amendment.
07/22/2020-10:30amHouseDEBATE - Pursuant H. Res. 891, the question shall be divided among the two House amendments. Pursuant to section 3(a) of H. Res. 891, the portion of the divided question comprising of the amendment specified in section 4(a) of H. Res. 891 shall be considered first. Each amendment specified in section 4 shall be debatable for one hour.
07/22/2020-10:29amHousePursuant to H. Res. 891, Ms. Jayapal was recognized to move that the House concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486 with amendments specified in section 4 of H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H3625-3638, H3666)
03/10/2020-7:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, H.R. 2486 and H.R. 6172. Resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, and H.R. 6172. For S.J. Res. 68, the resolution provides for 1 hour of debate and 1 motion to commit. For the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, the question will be divided and each portion will have 1 hour of debate. H.R. 6172 will have 1 hour ofdebate and 1 motion to recommit with or without instructions.
12/09/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/05/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/05/2019SenateS.Amdt.1255 Amendment SA 1255 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/05/2019SenateS.Amdt.1255 Amendment SA 1255 proposed by Senator Scott SC for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6865; text: CR S6894-6895) In the nature of a substitute.
12/05/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6865)
09/23/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 212.
09/19/2019SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/18/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/17/2019-5:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2019-5:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7734-7735)
09/17/2019-5:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2486.
09/17/2019-5:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7734-7737)
09/17/2019-5:15pmHouseMs. Adams moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/02/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
05/02/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/02/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2486. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (12/05/2019)

Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act or the FUTURE Act

This bill requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to disclose certain tax return information to the Department of Education (ED) for the purpose of administering financial aid and loan programs.

Upon receiving a request from ED, the IRS must disclose specified tax return information to ED for the purposes of

  • establishing enrollment, renewing enrollment, administering, and conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to income-contingent or income-based repayment programs;
  • discharging loans based on a total and permanent disability;
  • determining the eligibility for, and the amount of, federal student financial aid; and
  • conducting analyses and forecasts for estimating costs related to federal student financial aid programs.

ED may only use the disclosed information for the purposes above and for mitigating risks related to the programs. Mitigation of risks includes conducting oversight and reducing improper payments. It does not include conducting criminal investigations or prosecutions.

With the consent of the taxpayer, ED may disclose the return information to certain institutions of higher education, state higher education agencies, and scholarship organizations solely for the use in financial aid programs.

The bill specifies notification and reporting requirements related to the disclosures and the implementation of the bill.

The bill also permanently extends funding for minority-serving institutions of higher education and increases funding for Pell Grants.