There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Waiver Accountability and Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose requirements on the grant of a waiver with respect to an immigration detention facility, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/02/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/09/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/09/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/17/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/17/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 05/22/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 05/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/23/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/03/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 06/04/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/05/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/12/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/12/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/26/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/09/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/09/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/16/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/16/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/23/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/02/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship05/31/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2489 - Waiver Accountability and Transparency Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.