There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medical Nutrition Equity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the coverage of medically necessary food and vitamins and individual amino acids for digestive and inherited metabolic disorders under Federal health programs and private health insurance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/02/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/02/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/02/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/28/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/28/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/28/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 05/28/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/28/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/28/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/28/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/28/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/28/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/28/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/28/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/18/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 06/19/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 07/09/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/09/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/15/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/15/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 07/24/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 07/30/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 08/20/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/20/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 09/06/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/06/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/04/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 10/17/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/18/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/02/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services05/02/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/03/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform05/02/2019 Referred to

As of 10/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2501 - Medical Nutrition Equity Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.