There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To extend by 15 months the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend by two years the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to extend by 15 months the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/18/2019Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
01/18/2019Signed by President.
01/18/2019Presented to President.
01/17/2019Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H696)
01/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
01/08/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 3 (Roll no. 14).(text: CR H266)
01/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
01/18/2019Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
01/18/2019Signed by President.
01/18/2019HousePresented to President.
01/17/2019-12:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2019-12:12pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H696)
01/17/2019-12:01pmHouseThe House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 251.
01/17/2019-12:01pmHouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H696-698)
01/16/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.4 Amendment SA 4 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.4 Amendment SA 4 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S279; text: CR S279) To amend the title.
01/16/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.3 Amendment SA 3 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.3 Amendment SA 3 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S279; text: CR S279) To extend by 15 months the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security.
01/16/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S279)
01/10/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8.
01/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/08/2019-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/08/2019-7:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 3 (Roll no. 14). (text: CR H266)
01/08/2019-7:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H276-277)
01/08/2019-5:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/08/2019-4:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 251.
01/08/2019-4:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H266-270)
01/08/2019-4:36pmHouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/04/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/04/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/04/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security01/04/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/04/2019 Referred to

As of 09/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.251 - Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-2 (01/18/2019)

Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act

This bill extends by 15 months the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program.