There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

COUNTER Act of 2019
Coordinating Oversight, Upgrading and Innovating Technology, and Examiner Reform Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

COUNTER Act of 2019
Coordinating Oversight, Upgrading and Innovating Technology, and Examiner Reform Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

COUNTER Act of 2019
Coordinating Oversight, Upgrading and Innovating Technology, and Examiner Reform Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make reforms to the Federal Bank Secrecy Act and anti-money laundering laws, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
10/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8494-8501)
10/21/2019Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
10/21/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-245, Part I.
05/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
10/28/2019-4:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2019-4:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8494-8501)
10/28/2019-4:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2514.
10/28/2019-4:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8494-8503)
10/28/2019-4:48pmHouseMr. Scott, David moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/21/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
10/21/2019HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
10/21/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-245, Part I.
05/03/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/03/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/03/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/03/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services05/03/2019 Referred to
10/21/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-245
House Ways and Means05/03/2019 Referred to
10/21/2019 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/03/2019 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (50)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2514. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (10/28/2019)

Coordinating Oversight, Upgrading and Innovating Technology, and Examiner Reform Act of 2019 or the COUNTER Act of 2019

This bill generally revises requirements related to anti-money-laundering and counter-terrorism-financing laws.

Among other things, the bill

  • establishes new offices within financial regulatory agencies related to privacy and civil liberties;
  • creates programs within the Department of the Treasury to enable foreign and domestic outreach regarding these laws;
  • allows for increased information sharing between law enforcement, financial institutions, and financial regulators; and
  • revises whistleblower incentives related to actions brought by the Financial Crimes Enforcement Network (FinCEN).

The bill also increases penalties for violations of anti-money-laundering and counter-terrorism-financing laws, requires antiquities dealers to comply with these laws, and requires the reporting of beneficial ownership information to FinCEN in certain commercial real estate transactions.

Every five years, Treasury must update the threshold amounts for currency transaction reports to reflect inflation.