There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Postal Service Shipping Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, and title 39, United States Code, to provide the United States Postal Service the authority to mail alcoholic beverages, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2019Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/03/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/03/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/03/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/20/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/20/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/24/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/24/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 06/04/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/05/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 06/10/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/10/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/10/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 06/10/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/10/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/10/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 06/19/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/28/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 07/09/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/17/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2019
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/07/2019 06/03/2019 H4207

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform05/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/03/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/31/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2517 - United States Postal Service Shipping Equity Act


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.