There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tribal Heritage and Grizzly Bear Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect grizzly bear populations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/15/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
05/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2019Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/07/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife05/08/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Hearings by
House Agriculture05/07/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture06/07/2019 Referred to

As of 10/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2532 - Tribal Heritage and Grizzly Bear Protection Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.