There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Insider Trading Prohibition Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Insider Trading Prohibition Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Insider Trading Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to prohibit certain securities trading and related communications by those who possess material, nonpublic information.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 410 - 13 (Roll no. 649).
09/27/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-219.
05/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/05/2019-2:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2019-2:55pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 410 - 13 (Roll no. 649).
12/05/2019-2:45pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
12/05/2019-2:45pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/05/2019-2:44pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2534.
12/05/2019-2:44pmHouseH.Amdt.697 On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 196 - 231 (Roll no. 648).
12/05/2019-2:05pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 739, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga amendment No. 2.
12/05/2019-2:05pmHouseH.Amdt.697 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Huizenga. (consideration: CR H9276-9278; text: CR H9276)
12/05/2019-2:05pmHouseH.Amdt.696 On agreeing to the McHenry amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/05/2019-1:56pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 739, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McHenry amendment No. 1.
12/05/2019-1:55pmHouseH.Amdt.696 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McHenry. (consideration: CR H9275-9276; text: CR H9275)
12/05/2019-1:21pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2534.
12/05/2019-1:21pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Terri A. Sewell to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
12/05/2019-1:21pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 739 and Rule XVIII.
12/05/2019-1:20pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 and H. Con. Res. 77. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 under a structured rule, and makes in order that a motion to discharge H. Con. Res. 77 shall be in order on December 11, 2019.
12/05/2019-1:20pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 739. (consideration: CR H9271-9279)
12/03/2019-6:35pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 739 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 and H. Con. Res. 77. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 under a structured rule, and makes in order that a motion to discharge H. Con. Res. 77 shall be in order on December 11, 2019.
09/27/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 172.
09/27/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-219.
05/07/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/07/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services05/07/2019 Referred to
09/27/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-219
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/05/2019)

Insider Trading Prohibition Act

This bill generally provides statutory authority for the prohibition against securities trading, as well as related communications to others, by a person aware of material, nonpublic information. The bill further provides, for purposes of establishing a violation of this prohibition, that it is not necessary for such a person to know specifically how such information was obtained or whether a personal benefit was paid or promised.