There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado Wilderness Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate certain lands in the State of Colorado as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
11/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 13.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/20/2019Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
07/10/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/07/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 05/07/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/07/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands05/16/2019 Referred to
07/10/2019 Hearings by
11/20/2019 Discharged from

As of 12/15/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2546 - Colorado Wilderness Act of 2019


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.