There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Big Bear Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Big Bear Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Big Bear Land Exchange Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for an exchange of lands with San Bernardino County, California, to enhance management of lands within the San Bernardino National Forest, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9074)
06/27/2019Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-134.
01/04/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/21/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/20/2019-1:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/2019-1:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9074)
11/20/2019-1:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 255.
11/20/2019-1:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9074-9075)
11/20/2019-1:43pmHouseMr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
06/27/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-134.
05/01/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/01/2019HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
02/05/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/04/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/04/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/04/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Markup by
06/27/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-134
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands02/05/2019 Referred to
05/01/2019 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/21/2019 Referred to

As of 01/24/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.255 - Big Bear Land Exchange Act


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (06/27/2019)

Big Bear Land Exchange Act

This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to convey 73 acres of identified Forest Service land to the County of San Bernardino, California, in exchange for approximately 71 acres of identified land owned by the county. Before completing the exchange, USDA must relocate the portion of the Pacific Crest National Scenic Trail that is located on the federal land to (1) adjacent National Forest System land; (2) land owned by the county, subject to county approval; (3) land within the federal land, subject to county approval; or (4) a combination of any of these.