There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PFAS User Fee Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that polluters pay ongoing water treatment costs associated with contamination from perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/26/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
09/26/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
05/15/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3798)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
05/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/08/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/15/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/15/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/11/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change05/08/2019 Referred to
05/13/2019 Hearings by
09/26/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/08/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/09/2019 Referred to

As of 10/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2570 - PFAS User Fee Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.