There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Right-to-Work Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve and protect the free choice of individual employees to form, join, or assist labor organizations, or to refrain from such activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 05/08/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/08/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/16/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/12/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/12/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/26/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/27/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 06/27/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/10/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/15/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/18/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 07/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/26/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 09/09/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/09/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6] 09/09/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 09/09/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 09/10/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 09/19/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 09/25/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/08/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/12/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 01/08/2020
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/14/2020
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/24/2020
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 01/27/2020
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/28/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/03/2020
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 02/03/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/07/2020
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 02/14/2020
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 03/09/2020
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/11/2020
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/31/2020
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 04/17/2020
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 05/19/2020
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 05/28/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 05/28/2020
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/15/2020
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/15/2020
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/24/2020
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/24/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/06/2020
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 07/29/2020
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2571. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2019)

National Right-to-Work Act

This bill repeals those provisions of the National Labor Relations Act of 1938 and the Railway Labor Act that permit employers, pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement that is a union security agreement, to require employees to join a union as a condition of employment (including provisions permitting railroad carriers to require, pursuant to such an agreement, payroll deduction of union dues or fees as a condition of employment).