Text: H.R.2578 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (05/20/2019)

Calendar No. 93

116th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2578


To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 15, 2019

Received

May 16, 2019

Read the first time

May 20, 2019

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Reauthorization of National Flood Insurance Program.

(a) Financing.—Section 1309(a) of the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is amended by striking “May 31, 2019” and inserting “September 30, 2019”.

(b) Program expiration.—Section 1319 of the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is amended by striking “May 31, 2019” and inserting “September 30, 2019”.

(c) Retroactive effective date.—If this Act is enacted after May 31, 2019, the amendments made by subsections (a) and (b) shall take effect as if enacted on May 31, 2019.

Passed the House of Representatives May 14, 2019.

Attest:
Cheryl L. Johnson,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 93

116th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 2578

AN ACT
To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program, and for other purposes.

May 20, 2019
Read the second time and placed on the calendar