There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honest Ads Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance transparency and accountability for online political advertisements by requiring those who purchase and publish such ads to disclose information about the advertisements to the public, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/08/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 05/08/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/04/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/06/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/06/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 06/24/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 06/24/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/30/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 07/30/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/19/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration05/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2592. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2019)

Honest Ads Act

This bill applies requirements, limitations, and protections regarding political advertising in traditional media to internet or digital political advertising. The bill sets forth special rules for disclosure statements for certain internet or digital ads.

Each television or radio station, provider of cable or satellite television, or online platform must ensure that the political advertising it hosts is not directly or indirectly purchased by a foreign national.

Online platforms must publish a record of requests to purchase political advertising.