There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Healthy MOMMIES Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XIX and XXI of the Social Security Act to improve Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program for low-income mothers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/09/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 05/08/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 05/14/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/14/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/14/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 05/15/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/16/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/16/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 05/16/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/16/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/16/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/20/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 05/20/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/20/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/30/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 05/30/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 07/22/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 07/25/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/09/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/18/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/01/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/01/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/08/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/29/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/07/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/06/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2602. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2019)

Healthy MOMMIES Act

This bill establishes a series of programs and requirements under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) relating to maternal health.

For example, the bill expands eligibility for coverage under Medicaid and CHIP from 60 days to one year after the last day of pregnancy and requires such coverage to include oral health services.

The bill also establishes a demonstration program in which states receive grants to implement or expand models for maternity care homes that provide services to Medicaid or CHIP beneficiaries.

The Government Accountability Office must report on (1) gaps in coverage under Medicaid and CHIP for pregnant and postpartum women, and (2) the use of telemedicine by state Medicaid programs to increase access to maternity care.