There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support the people of Central America and strengthen United States national security by addressing the root causes of migration from El Salvador, Guatemala, and Honduras.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5780-5784)
05/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/15/2019-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-2:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5780-5784)
07/15/2019-2:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615.
07/15/2019-2:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/15/2019-2:47pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H5780-5786)
06/26/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/09/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/09/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/10/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 05/10/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/15/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/15/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 05/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 05/22/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/22/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/10/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 06/10/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/10/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/10/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/19/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/24/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/24/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 06/24/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 06/25/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/25/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/15/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/09/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
House Judiciary05/09/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship06/26/2019 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/16/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2615.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/15/2019)

United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act

This bill authorizes foreign assistance to El Salvador, Guatemala, and Honduras (the Northern Triangle), and requires the Department of State to devise strategies to address economic development, corruption, and other issues in those countries. It also requires reports on various related topics, including factors that drive migrants from those countries to the United States.

A portion of the assistance authorized for the Northern Triangle shall be conditioned upon the receiving country taking various actions, including (1) informing its citizens of the dangers of the journey to the United States, (2) fighting human and drug trafficking, and (3) combatting corruption.

The State Department shall devise strategies directed at the Northern Triangle region to (1) promote inclusive economic growth that addresses the underlying causes of poverty and inequality, (2) combat corruption, (3) strengthen democratic institutions and rule of law, and (4) improve security conditions through means such as the professionalization of security services.

The State Department shall designate a Senior Rule of Law Advisor for the Northern Triangle.

The State Department shall also devise a strategy to work with Mexico to strengthen its southern border.

The President shall impose sanctions on foreign persons determined to be involved in a significant act of corruption in a Northern Triangle country. Individuals who engage in such corruption shall be subject to property-blocking sanctions and barred from entering the United States.