There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Newborn Care Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the care provided by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to newborn children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/11/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
05/29/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 05/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/06/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/11/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/12/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/26/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/01/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/04/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 10/15/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/15/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/15/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/18/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/18/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/18/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/18/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 10/21/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/21/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 10/23/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/28/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/28/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/31/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/01/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 11/05/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 11/15/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 11/18/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 12/03/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/09/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/29/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2019)

Newborn Care Improvement Act of 2019

This bill increases from 7 to 14 the number of days that the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) may furnish health care services, including post-delivery care, to the newborn child of a woman veteran who delivered the child in a VA facility or another facility pursuant to a VA contract for such services.