There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Payment Choice Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit retail businesses from refusing cash payments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/09/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/09/2019Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 07/25/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/23/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 10/28/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 11/01/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/13/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 11/20/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 12/16/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 01/14/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2020
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 01/17/2020
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/17/2020
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 01/17/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/17/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/17/2020
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/17/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/17/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/17/2020
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/17/2020
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/17/2020
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/17/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2020
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/21/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 02/05/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/18/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/02/2020
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/12/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/12/2020
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 05/12/2020
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/18/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/18/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/24/2020
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 07/16/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/16/2020
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/21/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2650. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/09/2019)

Payment Choice Act of 2019

This bill makes it unlawful for a person selling goods or services at retail to (1) refuse to accept U.S. cash for the goods or services, (2) post signs or notices stating that cash payment is unaccepted, or (3) charge a higher price to a customer who pays by cash.