There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making appropriations for the Department of the Interior, environment, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
01/11/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 179 (Roll no. 27).
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/15/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 12.
01/14/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/11/2019-12:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2019-12:04pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 179 (Roll no. 27). (text: CR H469-487)
01/11/2019-11:54amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 229 (Roll no. 26).
01/11/2019-11:29amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H502-503)
01/11/2019-10:49amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Calvert demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
01/11/2019-10:48amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
01/11/2019-10:42amHouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Calvert motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to decrease the Bureau of Land Management, Management of Lands and Resources account by $6 million and increase the Wildland Fire Management account by a similar amount; and to increase the Forest Service, Forest and Rangeland Research account by $15 million, and decrease the Capital Improvement and Maintenance account by a similar amount.
01/11/2019-10:41amHouseMr. Calvert moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations.
01/11/2019-10:41amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/11/2019-9:19amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 266.
01/11/2019-9:18amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
01/11/2019-9:18amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 28. (consideration: CR H469-498)
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
01/08/2019-7:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 28 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.266. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

This bill provides FY2019 appropriations for the Department of the Interior, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), and related agencies.

The bill provides appropriations to Interior for

  • the Bureau of Land Management,
  • the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service,
  • the National Park Service,
  • the U.S. Geological Survey,
  • the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management,
  • the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement,
  • the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, and
  • the Bureau of Indian Affairs and Bureau of Indian Education.

The bill provides appropriations to Interior for Departmental Offices, including

  • the Office of the Secretary,
  • Insular Affairs,
  • the Office of the Solicitor,
  • the Office of Inspector General, and
  • the Office of the Special Trustee for American Indians.

The bill provides appropriations to Interior for Department-Wide Programs, including

  • Wildland Fire Management,
  • the Central Hazardous Materials Fund,
  • the Natural Resources Damage Assessment Fund,
  • the Working Capital Fund,
  • the Office of Natural Resources Revenue, and
  • Payments In Lieu of Taxes (PILT).

The bill also provides appropriations to the EPA and the Forest Service.

Within the Department of Health and Human Services, the bill provides appropriations for

  • the Indian Health Service,
  • the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences, and
  • the Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry.

The bill provides appropriations for several related agencies, including

  • the Executive Office of the President for the Council on Environmental Quality and the Office of Environmental Quality;
  • the Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board;
  • the Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation;
  • the Institute of American Indian and Alaska Native Culture and Arts Development;
  • the Smithsonian Institution;
  • the National Gallery of Art;
  • the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts;
  • the Woodrow Wilson International Center for Scholars;
  • the National Foundation on the Arts and Humanities, including the National Endowment for the Arts and the National Endowment for the Humanities;
  • the Commission of Fine Arts;
  • the Advisory Council on Historic Preservation;
  • the National Capital Planning Commission;
  • the U.S. Holocaust Memorial Museum;
  • the Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission;
  • the Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission; and
  • the World War I Centennial Commission.

Additionally, the bill sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.