There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Election Security Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Prevent Election Hacking Act of 2019
  • Voter Confidence and Increased Accessibility Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect elections for public office by providing financial support and enhanced security for the infrastructure used to carry out such elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
06/28/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/12/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Science, Space, and Technology, Foreign Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/23/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/23/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/23/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/23/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 05/23/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/11/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/11/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 06/21/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/21/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 08/16/2019

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration05/10/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security05/10/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation06/12/2019 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/10/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology05/10/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology05/10/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs05/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.