There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Asylum Seeker Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit funds from being used to implement the Migrant Protection Protocols announced by the Secretary of Homeland Security on December 20, 2018.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 05/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 05/14/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/14/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/14/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/15/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 05/20/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 05/20/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/23/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/09/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/09/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/11/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/11/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 07/16/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/13/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/19/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 10/28/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/28/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/29/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 11/08/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/08/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/08/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 01/15/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/15/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/16/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/24/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/03/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/03/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/06/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/06/2020
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 02/06/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/10/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/10/2020
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/10/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/10/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/21/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/26/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/03/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/04/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/15/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 08/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/10/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship06/26/2019 Referred to

As of 08/14/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2662 - Asylum Seeker Protection Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2019)

Asylum Seeker Protection Act

This bill prohibits the use of funds to implement or enforce the Migrant Protection Protocols announced on December 20, 2018.

(The protocol generally requires that aliens who are not clearly admissible arriving by land along the U.S.-Mexico border be returned to Mexico while their immigration proceedings are pending, rather than remain in the United States. The protocol applies to aliens seeking asylum but who have been assessed not to be more likely than not to face persecution or torture in Mexico.)