There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Waste Policy Amendments Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Nuclear Waste Policy Act of 1982, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date All Actions
11/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/26/2019Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
09/26/2019Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change
05/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/14/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change05/15/2019 Referred to
05/14/2019 Hearings by
09/26/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by
House Natural Resources05/14/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/03/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services05/14/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces05/15/2019 Referred to
House Budget05/14/2019 Referred to
House Rules05/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.