There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lowering Prescription Drug Costs and Extending Community Health Centers and Other Public Health Priorities Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To incentivize low-cost drug options and generic competition, and to provide extensions for community health centers and the National Health Service Corps, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/14/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/16/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/16/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 05/16/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/16/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/17/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/23/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/23/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/13/2019
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/21/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/29/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/13/2019
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 12/05/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/14/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/15/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/14/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet06/26/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law06/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.