There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (10)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SAFE Act
Securing America's Federal Elections Act

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Voter Confidence and Increased Accessibility Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to House

SAFE Act
Securing America's Federal Elections Act

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • Voter Confidence and Increased Accessibility Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Act
Securing America's Federal Elections Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Voter Confidence and Increased Accessibility Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect elections for public office by providing financial support and enhanced security for the infrastructure used to carry out such elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/27/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 225 - 184 (Roll no. 428).(text: CR H4207-4214)
06/26/2019Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
06/26/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 116-129, Part I.
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
06/28/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
06/27/2019-4:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2019-4:42pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 225 - 184 (Roll no. 428). (text: CR H4207-4214)
06/27/2019-4:34pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 189 - 220 (Roll no. 427).
06/27/2019-4:25pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
06/27/2019-4:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rodney Davis (IL) motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a new section to the bill that would require each chief state election official to disclose the identity of any foreign national with access to certain voting materials, including ballots or voting machines. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
06/27/2019-4:15pmHouseMr. Davis, Rodney moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on House Administration.
06/27/2019-4:14pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5243-5246)
06/27/2019-10:35amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 2722.
06/27/2019-10:35amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/27/2019-9:19amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2722.
06/27/2019-9:17amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 and H.R. 3351. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3351 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate.
06/27/2019-9:17amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 460. (consideration: CR H5207-5223)
06/26/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 94.
06/26/2019HouseCommittee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
06/26/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 116-129, Part I.
06/24/2019-11:51pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 460 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 and H.R. 3351. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2722 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3351 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate.
06/21/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 3.
06/21/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/14/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/14/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration05/14/2019 Referred to
06/21/2019 Markup by
06/26/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-129
House Science, Space, and Technology05/14/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Discharged from
Senate Rules and Administration06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2722. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/27/2019)

Securing America's Federal Elections Act or the SAFE Act

This bill addresses election security through grant programs and requirements for voting systems and paper ballots.

The bill establishes requirements for voting systems, including that systems (1) use individual, durable, voter-verified paper ballots; (2) make a voter's marked ballot available for inspection and verification by the voter before the vote is cast; (3) ensure that individuals with disabilities are given an equivalent opportunity to vote, including with privacy and independence, in a manner that produces a voter-verified paper ballot; (4) be manufactured in the United States; and (5) meet specified cybersecurity requirements, including the prohibition of the connection of a voting system to the internet.

The National Science Foundation must award grants to study, test, and develop accessible voter-verified paper ballot voting and best practices to enhance the accessibility of such voting for individuals with disabilities, for voters whose primary language is not English, and for voters with difficulties in literacy.

The Election Assistance Commission (EAC) must award grants to states to replace certain voting systems, carry out voting system security improvements, and implement and model best practices for ballot design, ballot instructions, and the testing of ballots.

States must carry out postelection risk-limiting audits for all federal elections, funded by the EAC.

States may use elections requirements payments from the EAC to carry out activities related to election security.

The EAC must provide for the testing of voting system hardware and software and decertify such technology that does not meet guidelines.