There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Banning Smoking on Amtrak Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

Banning Smoking on Amtrak Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Banning Smoking on Amtrak Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to prohibit smoking on Amtrak trains.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: 12/16/2019 CR H10275)
09/09/2019Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-199.
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/17/2019-2:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/17/2019-2:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10275)
12/17/2019-2:20pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10602)
12/16/2019-3:34pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Norton objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/16/2019-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2726.
12/16/2019-3:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10275-10276)
12/16/2019-3:22pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/09/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157.
09/09/2019HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-199.
06/26/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/26/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/26/2019HouseSubcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged.
05/15/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/14/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
05/14/2019HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E586)
05/14/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/17/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/14/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
09/09/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-199
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials05/15/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2726. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/17/2019)

Banning Smoking on Amtrak Act of 2019

This bill prohibits smoking on board National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak) trains, including smoking electronic cigarettes.