There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Adoptee Citizenship Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for automatic acquisition of United States citizenship for certain internationally adopted individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/14/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/05/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 07/05/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 07/05/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/05/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/05/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/05/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/15/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/15/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/15/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 07/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 07/30/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/09/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/09/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/09/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 09/09/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/09/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/09/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 10/17/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/28/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/28/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 10/28/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/12/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/12/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/21/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/21/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 11/21/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 11/21/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/09/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/09/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/13/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 12/13/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 12/16/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/16/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/11/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/12/2020
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/27/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2020
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/27/2020
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6] 02/27/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 02/28/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/04/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2020
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 03/10/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 03/10/2020
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 03/10/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/10/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/10/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/10/2020
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 04/10/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/14/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship06/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.