There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Savanna's Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Savanna's Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Attorney General to review, revise, and develop law enforcement and justice protocols appropriate to address missing and murdered Indians, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/16/2020Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
09/16/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-508, Part I.
05/14/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
09/16/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 408.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2020Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-508, Part I.
03/11/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/11/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/2020Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large]* 05/14/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/14/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/14/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/14/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/15/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/24/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/27/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/27/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 07/11/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/16/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/17/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 07/24/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/06/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 09/10/2019
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/13/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 11/14/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 11/18/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/20/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/10/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 12/16/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/05/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/06/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 02/25/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/25/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 02/26/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 03/13/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2020
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/13/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 06/11/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/11/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/15/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/13/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 07/13/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/29/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 08/11/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 09/01/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/01/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/15/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/14/2019 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
09/16/2020 Reported by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/26/2019 Referred to
03/10/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources05/14/2019 Referred to
09/16/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States06/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2733. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/14/2019)

Savanna's Act

This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to review, revise, and develop law enforcement and justice protocols to address missing and murdered Native Americans.

The bill requires DOJ to take the following actions:

  • provide training to law enforcement agencies on how to record tribal enrollment for victims in federal databases,
  • develop and implement a strategy to notify the public of the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System,
  • conduct specific outreach to tribes regarding the ability to publicly enter information through the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System or other non-law enforcement sensitive portal,
  • develop regionally appropriate guidelines for response to cases of missing and murdered Native Americans,
  • provide training and technical assistance to tribes and law enforcement agencies for implementation of the developed guidelines, and
  • report statistics on missing and murdered Native Americans.

The bill authorizes DOJ to provide grants for the purposes of (1) developing and implementing policies and protocols for law enforcement regarding cases of missing and murdered Native Americans, and (2) compiling and reporting data relating to missing and murdered Native Americans.

Federal law enforcement agencies must modify their guidelines to incorporate the guidelines developed by DOJ.

The Federal Bureau of Investigation shall include gender in its annual statistics on missing and unidentified persons published on its website.