There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Leading Infrastructure for Tomorrow's America Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Broadband Infrastructure Finance and Innovation Act of 2019
  • HOMES Act
  • Home Owner Managing Energy Savings Act of 2019
  • Local Energy Supply and Resiliency Act of 2019
  • Low-Income Solar Act of 2019
  • Next Generation 9-1-1 Act of 2019
  • PFAS Drinking Water Act
  • Providing Financial Assistance for Safe Drinking Water Act
  • Smart Building Acceleration Act
  • Smart Energy and Water Efficiency Act of 2019
  • Weatherization Enhancement and Local Energy Efficiency Investment and Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rebuild and modernize the Nation's infrastructure to expand access to broadband and Next Generation 9-1-1, rehabilitate drinking water infrastructure, modernize the electric grid and energy supply infrastructure, redevelop brownfields, strengthen health care infrastructure, create jobs, and protect public health and the environment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
06/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/04/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/22/2019Committee Hearings Held.
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
05/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 05/20/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 05/30/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 05/30/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/30/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/06/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/19/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/27/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/09/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/23/2019

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/15/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by
House Natural Resources05/15/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources06/04/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States06/04/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology05/15/2019 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy05/15/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/15/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/15/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/16/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials05/16/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit05/16/2019 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management05/16/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor05/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (91)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.