There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development to prescribe the manner in which programs of the agency are identified overseas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-334. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021Presented to President.
12/31/2020Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H9170)
02/13/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 475).(text: CR H5786)
05/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-334. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021HousePresented to President.
12/31/2020-10:07amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/31/2020-10:07amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9170)
12/31/2020-10:06amHouseMrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 2744, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9170)
02/20/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/13/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1082; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1082)
12/17/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 369.
12/17/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/11/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/15/2019-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H5786)
07/15/2019-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5812-5813)
07/15/2019-3:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/15/2019-3:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2744.
07/15/2019-3:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5786-5787)
07/15/2019-2:59pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/15/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/15/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/16/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.2744. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-334 (01/13/2021)

USAID Branding Modernization Act

This bill authorizes the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to use various markings, including USAID logos and the U.S. flag, to identify overseas USAID programs. The USAID Inspector General shall submit to Congress an audit of compliance with USAID branding requirements by partner entities implementing USAID programs.

Current law requires overseas USAID programs to be identified as American Aid. USAID guidelines authorize the use of the U.S. flag only in certain situations.