There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

USAID Branding Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development to prescribe the manner in which programs of the agency are identified overseas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/15/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 475).(text: CR H5786)
05/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/16/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/15/2019-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/15/2019-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H5786)
07/15/2019-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5812-5813)
07/15/2019-3:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/15/2019-3:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2744.
07/15/2019-3:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5786-5787)
07/15/2019-2:59pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
05/22/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/22/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/15/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/15/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 05/21/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/15/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.