There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Reported to House

SAFE Act
Safeguarding America's Future and Environment Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

SAFE Act
Safeguarding America's Future and Environment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish an integrated national approach to respond to ongoing and expected effects of extreme weather and climate change by protecting, managing, and conserving the fish, wildlife, and plants of the United States, and to maximize Government efficiency and reduce costs, in cooperation with State, local, and Tribal Governments and other entities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/01/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-481.
05/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
09/01/2020Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2020Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-481.
01/29/2020Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
01/29/2020Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
01/29/2020Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
01/29/2020Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
01/29/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/29/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/24/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/03/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources05/15/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Markup by
09/01/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-481
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources06/03/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indigenous Peoples of the United States06/03/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/03/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife06/03/2019 Referred to
09/24/2019 Hearings by
01/29/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2748. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House (09/01/2020)

Safeguarding America's Future and Environment Act or the SAFE Act

The bill requires the development of strategies to help fish, wildlife, and plants adapt to extreme weather changes and climate change.

Specifically, the bill requires the President to establish an interagency National Fish, Wildlife, and Plants Climate Adaptation Strategy Joint Implementation Working Group. The working group must adopt the 2013 National Fish, Wildlife, and Plants Climate Adaptation Strategy, which addresses the effects of extreme weather and climate change on fish, wildlife, and plants.

After the Committee on Earth and Environmental Sciences releases a periodic scientific assessment required under the U.S. Global Change Research Program, the working group must use sound science to review and revise the strategy to incorporate new information and advances in the development of strategies to help fish, wildlife, and plants adapt.

Each federal agency must integrate the strategy into agency plans, environmental reviews, and programs.

The Department of the Interior must establish a National Climate Change and Wildlife Science Center to assess and develop scientific information, tools, strategies, and techniques to support the working group and other interested parties in addressing the effects of extreme weather and climate change.

Interior must establish an Advisory Committee on Climate Change and Natural Resource Sciences to advise the working group.