There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restoring Justice for Workers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit forced arbitration in work disputes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/15/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McBath, Lucy [D-GA-6]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 05/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/15/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 06/27/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/17/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/18/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/24/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/26/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 10/22/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/22/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/22/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/22/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/15/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law06/26/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor05/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/15/2019)

Restoring Justice for Workers Act

This bill prohibits predispute arbitration agreements that require arbitration of an employment dispute.

It allows a postdispute arbitration agreement if the employee enters into it voluntarily without coercion and is informed in writing of rights and protections under such agreement. An employer may not retaliate against an employee for refusing to enter into an agreement for arbitrating an employment dispute.