There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Education to establish the Recognizing Inspiring School Employees (RISE) Award Program recognizing excellence exhibited by classified school employees providing services to students in prekindergarten through high school.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/12/2019Became Public Law No: 116-13. (TXT | PDF)
04/12/2019Signed by President.
04/04/2019Presented to President.
03/28/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/28/2019Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2098)
02/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 19 (Roll no. 89).(text: CR H2060-2061)
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
04/12/2019Became Public Law No: 116-13. (TXT | PDF)
04/12/2019Signed by President.
04/04/2019HousePresented to President.
04/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/28/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/28/2019SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2098)
02/26/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
02/25/2019-7:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/25/2019-7:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 19 (Roll no. 89). (text: CR H2060-2061)
02/25/2019-7:22pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2067)
02/25/2019-5:34pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/25/2019-5:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 276.
02/25/2019-5:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2060-2062)
02/25/2019-5:21pmHouseMrs. Lee (NV) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/08/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/10/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 01/23/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/24/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/24/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/28/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/2019
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 02/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/04/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/05/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/08/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/08/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/08/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/08/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 02/08/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/08/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/08/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/08/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/08/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/11/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2019
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/11/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/11/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/13/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/19/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/19/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/19/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/25/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 02/25/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/08/2019 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/26/2019 Referred to
03/28/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

This bill directs the Department of Education (ED) to grant "Recognizing Inspiring School Employees" awards to classified school employees, within certain occupational specialties, who provide exemplary service to students in prekindergarten through high school.

ED must annually select an awardee, out of nominations received from states, from any of the following occupational specialties: (1) paraprofessional services, (2) clerical and administrative services, (3) transportation services, (4) food and nutrition services, (5) custodial and maintenance services, (6) security services, (7) health and student services, (8) technical services, and (9) skilled trades.

The award and recognition provided shall have no monetary value.

ED shall develop uniform national guidelines for evaluating nominations.