There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ensuring Diverse Leadership Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Diverse Leadership Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Reserve Act to require Federal Reserve banks to interview at least one individual reflective of gender diversity and one individual reflective of racial or ethnic diversity when appointing Federal Reserve bank presidents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7576-7577)
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
09/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
09/10/2019-1:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/10/2019-1:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7576-7577)
09/10/2019-1:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 281.
09/10/2019-1:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7576-7579)
09/10/2019-1:38pmHouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 2.
07/11/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/25/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/25/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/25/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/25/2019
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/25/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/25/2019
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/25/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/25/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 01/25/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 01/25/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/25/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/25/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/25/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/25/2019
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 01/25/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 01/25/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/25/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/25/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/25/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/29/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/04/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/04/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 07/09/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/12/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 09/09/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/08/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.281. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/10/2019)

Ensuring Diverse Leadership Act of 2019

This bill requires that in making the appointment of a president, a Federal Reserve Bank must interview at least one individual reflective of gender diversity and one reflective of racial or ethnic diversity.

The bill amends numerous banking-, finance-, and trade-related Acts to make references to officials (including those to the Chairman of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System) gender-neutral.