There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Gold Star Mothers Families National Monument Extension Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Gold Star Families National Monument Extension Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Gold Star Families National Monument Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To extend the authority for the establishment of a commemorative work in honor of Gold Star Mothers Families, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the authority for the establishment of a commemorative work in honor of Gold Star Families, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 76).
10/18/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-243.
05/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/02/2020SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/28/2020-11:42amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
02/28/2020-11:42amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/28/2020-11:42amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 76).
02/28/2020-11:12amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1286)
02/26/2020-1:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/26/2020-1:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2819.
02/26/2020-1:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1207-1208; text: CR H1207)
02/26/2020-1:24pmHouseMr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/18/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193.
10/18/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-243.
09/18/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/18/2019HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
07/18/2019HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands
06/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/17/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/17/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/17/2019 Referred to
09/18/2019 Markup by
10/18/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-243
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/04/2019 Referred to
07/18/2019 Hearings by
09/18/2019 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/02/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2819. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/28/2020)

Gold Star Mothers Families National Monument Extension Act

This bill extends through January 2, 2024, the authority of the Gold Star Mothers National Monument Foundation to establish a commemorative work in honor of Gold Star families.