There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Marijuana Freedom and Opportunity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To decriminalize marijuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/10/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/07/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/21/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/20/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/20/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/20/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/23/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/23/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/04/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/04/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/20/2019

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/20/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/20/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/26/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources05/20/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/07/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture05/20/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry06/10/2019 Referred to
House Transportation05/20/2019 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Highways and Transit05/21/2019 Referred to
House Small Business05/20/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/2019)

Marijuana Freedom and Opportunity Act

This bill decriminalizes marijuana.

Specifically, it removes marijuana from the list of scheduled substances under the Controlled Substances Act and eliminates criminal penalties for an individual who imports, exports, manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana.

Additionally, the bill does the following:

  • establishes a trust fund to assist women-owned and minority-owned marijuana businesses,
  • requires federal research on the impacts of marijuana use on highway safety and public health,
  • authorizes federal restrictions on the marketing of marijuana-related products, and
  • authorizes grants for state and local governments to expunge or seal convictions for marijuana possession.