There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Ethan's Law

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 44 of title 18, United States Code, to require the safe storage of firearms, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/21/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 05/21/2019
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/21/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 06/03/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/03/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7] 06/11/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 06/11/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/21/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/21/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/02/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 07/02/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/10/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/11/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/17/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/17/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 09/17/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/20/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/20/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/20/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/20/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/20/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/20/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/20/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/20/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2] 09/20/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/20/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/20/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2019
Rep. Hill, Katie [D-CA-25] 09/20/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 09/20/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/20/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/20/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/20/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 09/20/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/20/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/26/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/15/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/21/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 10/22/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 10/22/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/22/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/31/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 11/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/20/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 11/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 11/20/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/22/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/22/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/26/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 11/29/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 12/04/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 12/04/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/04/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/04/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/10/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/17/2019
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 12/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/14/2020
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/24/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/10/2020
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/10/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/12/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/12/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/12/2020
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 02/12/2020
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/12/2020
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/14/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/18/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary05/21/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.