Committees: H.R.2881 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/21/2019 Referred to
11/20/2019 Markup by
01/07/2020 Reported by H. Rept. 116-369
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology05/22/2019 Referred to
09/27/2019 Hearings by
11/14/2019 Markup by
11/14/2019 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs05/21/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by
01/07/2020 Discharged from