There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

AFTER Act of 2019
Animal Freedom from Testing, Experiments, and Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to allow for the adoption or non-laboratory placement of certain animals used in Federal research, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/21/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/22/2019Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/04/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/04/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/04/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/05/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/11/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/11/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/13/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/13/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 06/19/2019
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 06/25/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/25/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 06/25/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 06/25/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/25/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 08/16/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 08/16/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/16/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 08/16/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/16/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/16/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 08/16/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/18/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/18/2019
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/24/2019
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/15/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/22/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture06/21/2019 Referred to

As of 10/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2897 - AFTER Act of 2019


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2897. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2019)

Animal Freedom from Testing, Experiments, and Research Act of 2019 or the AFTER Act of 2019

This bill requires federal research facilities to facilitate the adoption or nonlaboratory placement of certain warm-blooded animals (e.g., dogs, cats, monkeys, guinea pigs, hamsters, and rabbits) with animal rescue organizations, animal sanctuaries, animal shelters, or individuals. In order to be adopted or placed, the animals must (1) no longer be needed for research; (2) be suitable for release; (3) not be birds, rats, or mice.