There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Respond NOW Act
Respond to the Needs in the Opioid War Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address the opioid epidemic, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/26/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, the Budget, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, the Budget, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, the Budget, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, the Budget, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, the Budget, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/22/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/28/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/06/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 06/10/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/18/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/16/2019

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary05/22/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/26/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/22/2019 Referred to
House Budget05/22/2019 Referred to
House Education and Labor05/22/2019 Referred to

As of 11/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2922 - Respond NOW Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.