There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Providing Benefits Information in Spanish and Tagalog for Veterans and Families Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Providing Benefits Information in Spanish and Tagalog for Veterans and Families Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make all fact sheets of the Department of Veterans Affairs in English, Spanish, and Tagalog.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make all fact sheets of the Department of Veterans Affairs in English and Spanish.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7204-7205)
07/18/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-158.
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
07/24/2019SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/23/2019-5:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-5:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7204-7205)
07/23/2019-4:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2943.
07/23/2019-4:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7204-7206)
07/23/2019-4:59pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/18/2019HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118.
07/18/2019HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-158.
06/20/2019HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
05/23/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/11/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 07/11/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 07/11/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/23/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Hearings by
07/18/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-158

As of 10/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2943 - Providing Benefits Information in Spanish and Tagalog for Veterans and Families Act


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.