There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title X of the Public Health Service Act to prohibit family planning grants from being awarded to any entity that performs abortions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/25/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/08/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/08/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/09/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/09/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 01/09/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/09/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/09/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/09/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/10/2019
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 01/10/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/14/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/14/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/15/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/15/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steven C., Jr. [R-KS-2] 01/15/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/15/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 01/15/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 01/15/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 01/16/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 01/16/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 01/16/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/16/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/17/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/22/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/24/2019
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 01/28/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 01/28/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 01/28/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 01/28/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/08/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/13/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/13/2019
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/04/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 03/27/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/14/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/17/2019
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 05/22/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/08/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.296. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Title X Abortion Provider Prohibition Act

This bill prohibits the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) from awarding federal family planning grants to entities that provide, or that financially support the provision of, abortions. Specifically, in order to receive such grants, entities must certify that, during the period of the grant, they will not perform abortions or provide funds to entities that perform abortions. Exceptions are made for abortions where (1) the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest; or (2) a physician certifies that the woman suffered from a physical disorder, injury, or illness that would place the woman in danger of death unless an abortion is performed, including a condition caused by or arising from the pregnancy. Hospitals are exempted unless they provide funds to non-hospital entities that perform abortions.

HHS must include in an annual report (1) information on grantees who performed abortions under the exceptions, and (2) a list of entities to which grant funds are made available.