There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to improve the communications of the Department of Veterans Affairs relating to services available for women veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/11/2019Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/13/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 09/27/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/23/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/13/2019 Referred to
09/11/2019 Hearings by

As of 10/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2972 - To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to improve the communications of the Department of Veterans Affairs relating to services available for women veterans, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.