There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Historical Publications and Records Commission Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 44, United States Code, to reauthorize the National Historical Publications and Records Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/12/2019Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14.
06/12/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/23/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/06/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 09/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform05/23/2019 Referred to
06/12/2019 Markup by

As of 09/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2978 - National Historical Publications and Records Commission Reauthorization Act of 2019


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.